Dressler, Sarah Helen (CPSO#: 101001)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Oct 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2014