Drever, John Michael (CPSO#: 21488)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 29 May 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008