Drew, Brian Michael (CPSO#: 71195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Ewen Rd
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone: (905) 527-0660
Fax: (905) 527-6214
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Drew Medicine Professional Corporaiton

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Drew ( CPSO# 71195 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Performance Physiotherapy
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Phone Number: (905) 527-5111

Business Address:
Altum Health Cambridge Clinic
405 Maple Grove
Unit 1
Cambridge ON  N3E 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 653-9203

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone Number: (905) 527-0660

Business Address:
Altum Health Centennial
516 Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton ON  L8E 0G2
Phone Number: (905) 664-3300

Business Address:
Altum Health Queensdale
688 Queensdale Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 396-9437

Business Address:
Altum Health Mississauga
2 Robert Speck Parkway
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1H8
Phone Number: (905) 897-7007

Business Address:
Altum Health Oakville
519 Dundas Street West
Oakville ON  L6M 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 257-0073

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL DREW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DREW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2003