Drexler, Michael (CPSO#: 96355)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 19 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013