Dreyer, Jonathan Frederic (CPSO#: 42799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 6676538
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Four Counties Health Services
RR #3
1824 Concession Dr.
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Canada
Phone: (519) 693-7111 Ext. 2414
Fax: (519) 693-1202
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan F. Dreyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dreyer ( CPSO# 42799 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Four Counties Health Services
RR #3
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-7111

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN FREDERIC DREYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DREYER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1984