Dreyzin, Ilona (CPSO#: 63883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pure Spa
1761 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Y8
Phone: (416) 850-8431
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilona Dreyzin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Dreyzin ( CPSO# 63883 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
3030 Lawrenece Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILONA DREYZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DREYZIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992