Dreyzin, Vadim (CPSO#: 68001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsway Financial Spinal Centre
Trillium Health Centre
3rd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4141
Fax: (416) 521-4140
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vadim Dreyzin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dreyzin ( CPSO# 68001 )

Business Address:
Kingsway Financial Spinal Centre
Trillium Health Centre
3rd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VADIM DREYZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DREYZIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996