Driedger, Albert Abram (CPSO#: 21759)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert A. Driedger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 16 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013