Driman, David Kevin (CPSO#: 60688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
A3-142
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36378
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 International Blvd
Mississauga ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
Phone: 416-675-4530
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Driman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Driman ( CPSO# 60688 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
University Hospital Room A3-142
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Mississauga ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 27 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KEVIN DRIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRIMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1993