Driman, Naomi Malka (CPSO#: 88789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone: (416) 785-8412
Fax: (416) 785-8324
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI MALKA DRIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRIMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011