Dror, Yigal (CPSO#: 69635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 13 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematology / Oncology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5886
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIGAL DROR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF HEMATOLOGY/ONCOLOGY, THE HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN in which Dr. DROR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. DROR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DROR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. DROR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. DROR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Oct 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Aug 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2005