Druck, Maurice Nathan (CPSO#: 28619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
620 Vesta Drive
Toronto ON  M5N 1H9
Phone: (416) 930-7028
Fax: (416) 781-3907
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 110
470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-3025
Fax: (905) 878-1525
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.N. Druck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Druck ( CPSO# 28619 )

Business Address:
620 Vesta Drive
Toronto ON  M5N 1H9
Phone Number: (416) 930-7028

Business Address:
Suite 110
470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 878-3025


Corporation Name: Maurice Druck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 28 Jul 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICE NATHAN DRUCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976