Drucker, Daniel Joshua (CPSO#: 32728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue Mailbox 39
TCP5-1004
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 361-2661
Fax: (416) 361-2669
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drucker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rosen ( CPSO# 51512 )
Dr. D. Drucker ( CPSO# 32728 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
TCP5-1004
Mailbox 39
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 361-2661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOSHUA DRUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUCKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987