Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Drummond, Robert (CPSO#: 66253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's Hospital
3830 Lacombe Avenue
Montreal QC  H3T 1M5
Phone: (514) 345-3511 Ext. 3460
Fax: (514) 734-2644

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DRUMMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUMMOND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1993