Drzewiecki, Anna Elizabeth (CPSO#: 31736)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1994