DuVernet, Chantal Julie (CPSO#: 65601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smiths Falls
District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTAL JULIE DUVERNET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUVERNET is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993