Dua, Varinder (CPSO#: 60698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjab University India, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 434-9666
Fax: (519) 434-9982
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit F
1553 Dundas Street
London ON  N5W 5Y5
Canada
Phone: (519) 434-9666
Fax: (519) 434-9952
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Unit 7
971 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N5Z 3H9
Canada
Phone: (519) 473-7716
Fax: (519) 473-1571
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varinder Dua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dua ( CPSO# 60698 )

Business Address:
550 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 434-9666

Business Address:
1553 Dundas Street
Unit F
London ON  N5W 5Y5
Phone Number: (519) 434-9666

Business Address:
7 - 971 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N5Z 3H9
Phone Number: (519) 473-7716

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARINDER DUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1990