Dua, Vikram (CPSO#: 62405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Surrey Place Centre
2 Surrey Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C2
Phone: (416) 925-5141
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikram Dua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dua ( CPSO# 62405 )

Business Address:
Surrey Place Centre
2 Surrey Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 925-5141

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM DUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015