Duarte, Anthony Clement (CPSO#: 59781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McLeod Seacoast Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4000 Hwy 9 E,Little River SC 29566
Little River SC  29566
United States
Phone: (843) 390-8100
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor regional hospital
1995 Lens avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52222
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina
USA - South Carolina
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CLEMENT DUARTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUARTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2009