Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dubarsky, Howard Bryan (CPSO#: 60853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3328 McCarthy Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0H9
Phone: 613-596-5009
Fax: (613) 596-5230
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Dubarsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dubarsky ( CPSO# 60853 )

Business Address:
3328 McCarthy Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0H9
Phone Number: (613) 596-5009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD BRYAN DUBARSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBARSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990