Dubberley, James Hugh (CPSO#: 74456)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jan 2000 to 06 Feb 2000
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2002