Dube, Christine (CPSO#: 75929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Departement D'Urgence
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4212
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Dube Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dube ( CPSO# 75929 )

Business Address:
7 - 3712 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1W 0C8

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2001