Dube, Mark Richard (CPSO#: 64276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1744 Oriole Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 5L7
Phone: (705) 522-2263
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Dube Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dube ( CPSO# 64276 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
865 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
825 Mckinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Business Address:
1744 Oriole Drive
Sudbury ON  P3C 5L7
Phone Number: (705) 522-2263

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Apr 2000
Summary:

 On April 10, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Dube(s plea of guilty and found him guilty 
 of professional misconduct with respect to engaging in conduct or an act relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee ordered the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr.  Dube is required to attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2.	The fact of 
 the reprimand is to be recorded on the Register;
3.	The Registrar is directed to suspend the 
 certificate of registration of Dr. Dube for a period of one month, to commence on a date to be set 
 by the Registrar;
4.	The suspension is itself to be suspended provided that Dr.  Dube successfully 
 complete a boundary course designed or approved by the College, at his own expense, within one 
 year of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 10, 2000