Dubo, Elyse Diedre (CPSO#: 59369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3080 Yonge St, Suite 5016
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: (416) 322-5433
Fax: (416) 322-5432
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dubo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gelman ( CPSO# 69528 )
Dr. E. Dubo ( CPSO# 59369 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8200

Business Address:
Unit 5016
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (416) 322-5433

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Division
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELYSE DIEDRE DUBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1989