Dubois, Anthony Ewoud Jan (CPSO#: 57378)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:Free University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2005