Dubois, Brian Joseph (CPSO#: 60143)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1996