Ducas, Diane Athena (CPSO#: 54303)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2006