Ducas, Robin Alexandra (CPSO#: 90339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St.
Toronto ON  M5G2C4
Phone: 4163405309
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN ALEXANDRA DUCAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2012 to 22 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2015