Duchaine, Sylvain Paul (CPSO#: 60810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2541
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sylvain Duchaine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duchaine ( CPSO# 60810 )

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2541

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVAIN PAUL DUCHAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCHAINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1990