Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Duchastel, Paul (CPSO#: 64365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2045 Dufferin Street
suite 102-B
Toronto ON  M6E 3R4
Phone: (416) 656-7733
Fax: (416) 656-6502
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul A Duchastel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Duchastel ( CPSO# 64365 )

Business Address:
102B - 2045 Dufferin
Toronto ON  M6E 3R4
Phone Number: (416) 656-6500


Corporation Name: Mahboob Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Duchastel ( CPSO# 64365 )
Dr. M. Mahboob ( CPSO# 105456)

Business Address:
Dufferin Medical Centre
Suite 102
2045 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6E 3R4
Phone Number: (416) 656-7733

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL DUCHASTEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCHASTEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: September 29, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

SCERP Summary:

On September 29, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required family medicine physician, Dr. Paul Duchastel, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Duchastel to:

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for nine months;

• Provide a written summary of each guideline or tool with reference to how it is applicable to family medicine, including:
o Rourke Baby Record 2014
o Clinical Practice Guidelines on primary care management of diabetes and hypertension
o Ontario Immunization Schedule and Canadian Immunization Guide
o Clinical Practice Guidelines for screening for cervical, breast and colon cancer as contained in Cancer Care Ontario’s Screen for Life

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan.