Duchesne, Catherine Jane (CPSO#: 51294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: Nuth, Catherine Jane (used until: 11 Aug 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Phone: (613) 226-4030
Fax: (613) 225-3891
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Duchesne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Duchesne ( CPSO# 51294 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
1580 Merivale Road
Nepean ON  K2G 4B5
Phone Number: (613) 226-4030

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE JANE DUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCHESNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1985