Duchesne, Lloyd James (CPSO#: 65073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7277
Fax: (613) 696-7132
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lloyd J. Duchesne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 65298 )
Dr. L. Duchesne ( CPSO# 65073 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4512

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. LLOYD JAMES DUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCHESNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993