Duchesne, Nathalie (CPSO#: 78563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1050 Chemin Ste-Foy
Quebec QC  G1S 4L8
Phone: 418-682-7511 Ext. 84970
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Imagix, Boul Lapiniere
Brossard QC  G0A3P0
Canada
Phone: 4184736553
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE DUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCHESNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009