Ducic, Yadranko (CPSO#: 63575)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yugoslav

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2004