Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ducros, Genevieve Marie (CPSO#: 66156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 Wing CFB Trenton
24 Canadian Forces Hosp Serv
PO Box 1000
50 Yukon Street
Astra ON  K0K 3W0
Phone: (613) 392-2811 Ext. 3480
Fax: (613) 965-7214
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Ducros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ducros ( CPSO# 66156 )

Business Address:
8 Wing CFB Trenton
24 Canadian Forces Hospital Services Centre
50 Yukon Street
PO Box 1000 Station Forces
Astra ON  K0K 3W0
Phone Number: (613) 392-2811

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE DUCROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCROS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006