Dudek, Malgorzata (CPSO#: 68086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Bialystok University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 43029
Fax: (416) 242-1025
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-6315
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALGORZATA DUDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 24 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 1997 to 17 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996