Dudek, Nancy Lorraine (CPSO#: 73656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350 Ext. 75596
Fax: 613-739-6974
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Dudek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dudek ( CPSO# 73656 )

Business Address:
Unit 1105D
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-7350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY LORRAINE DUDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004