Dudgeon, Deborah Jane (CPSO#: 55328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Phone: (613) 548-2485
Fax: (613) 548-2436
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH JANE DUDGEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDGEON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1997