Dudok, David Vladimir (CPSO#: 91384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 200
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 258-0162
Fax: (519) 252-7223
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

230 Victoria St
London ON  N6A 2C2
Canada
Phone: (519) 873-1700
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David V. Dudok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dudok ( CPSO# 91384 )

Business Address:
South Walkviller Medical centre
Suite 200
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 258-0162

Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID VLADIMIR DUDOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2015