Dueck, Dorie-Anna Corinne Constance (CPSO#: 75189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saskatoon Cancer Centre
20 Campus Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 4H4
Phone: (306) 655-2662
Fax: (306) 655-2910
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dorie-Anna Dueck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIE-ANNA CORINNE CONSTANCE DUECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 24 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003