Duff, Sharon Rose (CPSO#: 81162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seniors Mental Health Program
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th St.
Hamilton Ontario, L8N 3K7
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36396
Fax: (905) 381-5613
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.R. Duff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duff ( CPSO# 81162 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Seniors Mental Health
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ROSE DUFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010