Duff, Susie (CPSO#: 42816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside South Medical Centre
665 Earl Armstrong Road, Unit C
Ottawa ON  K1V 2G2
Phone: (613) 822-0411
Fax: (613) 822-1399
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susie Duff Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duff ( CPSO# 42816 )

Business Address:
Riverside South Medical Centre
665 Earl Armstrong Road Unit C
Ottawa ON  K1V 2G2
Phone Number: (613) 822-0411

Business Address:
307 - 1062 Ghislain Road
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3B2
Phone Number: (613) 636-0118

Business Address:
Canadian Forces Health Services Centre Ottawa
Specialty Clinic - Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1551

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSIE DUFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1989