Duffin, Jacalyn Mary (CPSO#: 31466)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016