Duffy, Anne Cecilia (CPSO#: 65138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson 5-Rm J012-0
166 Brock Street
Kingston, Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 514-3400 Ext. 3526
Fax: (613) 544-9666
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mood Disorders Centre of Ottawa
University of Ottawa Health Service
1 Nicholas Street Suite 302
Ottawa ON  K1N 7B7
Canada
Phone: (613) 526-3091
Fax: (613) 526-3092
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE CECILIA DUFFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1992