Duffy, Ciaran Maire (CPSO#: 50469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University College of Dublin, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital Of Eastern Ont
Max Keeping Wing
Room W1420
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2636
Fax: (613) 738-4864
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CIARAN MAIRE DUFFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFFY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1985