Duffy, Gavin Raymond (CPSO#: 58489)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Unit 13 391 Empire Avenue St. John's, Newfoundland and Labrador A1E 1W6
Date Received: 24 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013