Duffy, Patrick John (CPSO#: 54654)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 1993