Duffy, Peter Joseph (CPSO#: 67170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

16 Tradewinds Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6Y4
Canada
Phone: (613) 440-1949
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Duffy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Duffy ( CPSO# 67170 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology
Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH DUFFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1994