Dufresne, Francois (CPSO#: 80343)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2013