Dufresne, Maurice Joseph Arnold (CPSO#: 44343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Trainyards Health And
Wellness Centre
Unit B22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J.A. Dufresne Medicine Professional Corporation/M.J.A. Dufresne Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dufresne ( CPSO# 44343 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Trainyards
Health and Wellness Centre
Unit B22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-4770

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICE JOSEPH ARNOLD DUFRESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFRESNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1994